This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 03:43:27 (UTC).

MARIABELEN BASULTO, A MINOR, BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, BELEN BASULTO VS ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 MARIABELEN BASULTO, A MINOR, BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, BELEN BASULTO filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ST FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8812

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIABELEN BASULTO A MINOR BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM BELEN BASULTO

Defendants

SEIF MEDHAT M.D.

ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER

MEDHAT SEIF M.D. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DONAHUE THOMAS E.

DONAHUE THOMAS EDWARD ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

LYNCH GREGORY G.

WATSON ALEXANDER M

LYNCH GREGORY GORDON ESQ.

FRASER STEPHEN CLARK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Status Report - STATUS REPORT - JOINT

5/11/2021: Status Report - STATUS REPORT - JOINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

5/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Notice - NOTICE RE UPDATE ON BANKRUPTCY RELIEF GRANTED TO PLAINTIFF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY

12/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE UPDATE ON BANKRUPTCY RELIEF GRANTED TO PLAINTIFF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFE...)

12/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFE...) OF 12/09/2020

12/9/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: BANKRUPTCY RE: BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEFE...) OF 12/09/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF EFFECTIVE DATE OF PLAN OF LIQUIDATION

11/3/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF EFFECTIVE DATE OF PLAN OF LIQUIDATION

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

9/8/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO SECTION 9 OF THE CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION STANDARDS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/8/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/8/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/8/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/3/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/6/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Demand for Jury Trial

8/27/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/26/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/26/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/26/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2023
  • Hearing05/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Hearing05/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketStatus Report (- Joint); Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketNotice (RE UPDATE ON BANKRUPTCY RELIEF GRANTED TO PLAINTIFF FROM AUTOMATIC STAY); Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy (ReBankruptcy Filed by Defendant St.Francis Medical Center on 08/31/2018) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy Re: Bankruptcy Filed by Defe...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Mariabelen Basulto, a minor, by and thorugh her guardian ad litem, Belen Basulto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDHAT SEIF M.D. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONAHUE, THOMAS E.