This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/24/2021 at 17:00:14 (UTC).

MARIA ZAVALZA VS ADRIANA TREJO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2021 MARIA ZAVALZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADRIANA TREJO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2611

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAVALZA MARIA

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TREJO GABRIEL

TREJO ADRIANA

CITY OF DOWNEY

Defendant and Cross Defendant

CITY OF DOWNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN HOWARD

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON EDOR G. III

GOLDSTEIN HOWARD

BAKMAN YELENA

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/2/2021: Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

7/26/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/26/2021: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/8/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

9/8/2021: Answer

Answer

11/17/2021: Answer

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2024
  • Hearing03/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • Hearing09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Downey (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Maria Zavalza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by City of Downey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Zavalza (Plaintiff); Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Zavalza (Plaintiff); Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Zavalza (Plaintiff); Adriana Trejo (Defendant); Gabriel Trejo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF DOWNEY A GOVERNMENT ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN HOWARD