This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/05/2023 at 08:17:52 (UTC).

MARIA WOLBURG VS SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 MARIA WOLBURG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6254

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLBURG MARIA

Defendants

FASHION NOVA INC.

PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC.

PREFERRED SERVICES GROUP LLC

VENSURE HR INC.

PICENO JOSE

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC.

ADECCO USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI APLC

Defendant Attorneys

MASON BENJAMIN KENDALL

WANEIS PETER M.

WHITEHEAD LEAH

WINFIELD ALECIA W.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

3/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

3/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER M. WANEIS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

3/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER M. WANEIS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/19/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Separate Statement

2/19/2020: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

2/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/19/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

2/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/18/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

2/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Separate Statement

2/18/2020: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/18/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Answer

2/11/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/4/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Maria Wolburg on 12/31/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maria Wolburg as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNotice OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Filed by: Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Settlement: Status Date changed from 03/18/2020 to 03/18/2020; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing re: Dismissal Date scheduled for 08/12/2020 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/15/2020 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 05/04/2020 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
144 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Vensure HR, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons & Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Vensure HR, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff); As to: Preferred Services Group LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/04/2018; Service Cost: 52.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketDocument:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketDocument:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketCalendaring:Conference-Case Management 01/10/19 at 8:45 am Terry Green

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Wrongful Termination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less