This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2020 at 07:20:06 (UTC).

MARIA WOLBURG VS SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 MARIA WOLBURG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6254

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WOLBURG MARIA

Defendants

FASHION NOVA INC.

PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC.

PREFERRED SERVICES GROUP LLC

VENSURE HR INC.

PICENO JOSE

SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC.

ADECCO USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF RAMIN R. YOUNESSI APLC

Defendant Attorneys

MASON BENJAMIN KENDALL

WINFIELD ALECIA W.

WHITEHEAD LEAH

WANEIS PETER M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Settlement

3/18/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

3/18/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

3/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER M. WANEIS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

3/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PETER M. WANEIS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/19/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Separate Statement

2/19/2020: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

2/19/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/19/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

2/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEFENDANT FASHION NOVA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Motion for Summary Judgment

2/18/2020: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

2/18/2020: Notice - NOTICE COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT

Separate Statement

2/18/2020: Separate Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/18/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Answer

2/11/2020: Answer

Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/4/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint

12/31/2019: Amended Complaint

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNotice ( OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)); Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order Advancing the Hearing Date (O/C CASE SETTLED)) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
102 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Wolburg (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. DISCRIMINATION IN VIOLATION OF GOV'T CODE 12940 ET SEQ. ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PURPOSE DRIVEN PERSONNEL INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SOLVIS STAFFING SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where FASHION NOVA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VENSURE HR INC. AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant