Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2019 at 07:37:04 (UTC).

MARIA VEGA VS MICROSOFT THEATER ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 MARIA VEGA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MICROSOFT THEATER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5413

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

VEGA MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES `1 TO 20

L.A. LIVE THEATRE LLC

AANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP

MICROSOFT THEATER

AEG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAURO FIORE JR.

Defendant Attorney

LENKOV JEFFREY MYLES

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

9/4/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, L.A. LIVE THEATRE, LLC, TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/26/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, L.A. LIVE THEATRE, LLC, TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

11/7/2018: Unknown

Request for Dismissal

12/12/2018: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Compel Discovery

1/25/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Motion to Compel Discovery

1/25/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery

Declaration

1/25/2019: Declaration

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

3/29/2019: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Unknown

5/1/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

5/1/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Settlement

5/1/2019: Notice of Settlement

SUMMONS

2/26/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/26/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 11:23 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice of Settlement; Filed by L.A. Live Theatre,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement) of 05/01/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by L.A. Live Theatre,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by L.A. Live Theatre,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (or Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Admissions, Set oNe) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • Answer; Filed by L.A. Live Theatre,LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Vega (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AEG CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LA LIVE THEATRE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ANSCHUTZ ENTERTAINMENT GROUP INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENKOV JEFFREY MYLES