This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/22/2021 at 00:28:39 (UTC).

MARIA VASQUEZ VS SYNERMED, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 MARIA VASQUEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against SYNERMED, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1881

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VASQUEZ MARIA

Defendants

SYNERMED INC.

ACHIEVAMED INC.

VENTURA MAYRENE

DIAZ MARIA

BALINGIT KRISTINA

ANNEX FINANCIAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IRMAS JARED ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

PARRISH PAIGE ROGERS

LEE TIFFANY

LEE TIFFANY M.

LEE TIFFANY ESQ.

LOPEZ RICARDO

PARRISH PAIGE R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

10/12/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

10/12/2021: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIFFANY LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

10/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIFFANY LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

10/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/12/2021

Opposition - OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT SYNERMED, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/12/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION BY PLAINTIFF TO DEFENDANT SYNERMED, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA VAZQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SYNERMED, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

10/12/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF MARIA VAZQUEZ IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SYNERMED, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice of Continuance

10/13/2021: Notice of Continuance

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/10/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/9/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/03/2021

6/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/03/2021

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

4/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2021

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/9/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Separate Statement

12/9/2020: Separate Statement

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • Hearing04/22/2022 at 11:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Hearing01/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Jury Trial ((7 days)) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (or, in the Alternative, Summary Adjudication of Issues;) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Synermed, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • Docketat 3:59 PM in Department 53, Robert B. Broadbelt, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF TIFFANY LEE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES); Filed by Synermed, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketReply (TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION OF ISSUES); Filed by Synermed, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (Of Non Service); Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non Service); Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketDeclaration (of Non-Service); Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint (1st); Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketComplaint (for Damages); Filed by Maria Vasquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SYNERMED INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANNEX FINANCIAL INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IRMAS JARED M.