This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/10/2022 at 14:46:06 (UTC).

MARIA VASQUEZ VS VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 MARIA VASQUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VASQUEZ MARIA

Respondents

CILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC.

GOINGS & GOINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

SCHADRACK MARK ALLEN

Respondent Attorneys

HEALEY JEFFREY SCOTT

WALKER KATHLEEN MARIE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

10/16/2019: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AS TO THE ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

8/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; UNCONDITIONAL

7/1/2019: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE; UNCONDITIONAL

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL

7/23/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING RE DISMISSAL

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/7/18

5/7/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 5/7/18

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RECORDS SHOULD ...)

5/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY RECORDS SHOULD ...)

Request for Refund / Order

3/25/2019: Request for Refund / Order

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/26/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/26/19

3/26/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/26/19

Notice of Ruling

3/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' (VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. DBA VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER; GOINGS & GOINGS, INC. DBA PROGRESSIVE HEAL TH CARE) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOIN

3/22/2019: Response - RESPONSE DEFENDANTS' (VILLA ELENA CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, INC. DBA VILLA ELENA HEALTHCARE CENTER; GOINGS & GOINGS, INC. DBA PROGRESSIVE HEAL TH CARE) RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOIN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR)

3/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER TO APPOINT AN ARBITRATOR)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

3/12/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/12/19

3/12/2019: Order - ORDER RE: HEARING OF 3/12/19

Notice of Ruling

3/14/2019: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

3/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (as to the Entire Action With Prejudice); Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Order to Show Cause Hearing Re Dismissal); Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement (of Entire Case; Unconditional); Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department C; Hearing on Motion for Order (to Show Cause Why Records Should Not Be Produced) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketPetition (NOTICE OF PETITION AND PETITION TO COMPEL BINDING ARBITRATION AND REQUEST FOR STAY OF THE ACTION); Filed by Villa elena convalescent hospital, inc. (Respondent); goings & goings, inc. (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Motion and Trial Preference; Declaration of Mark A. Scharack; Declaration of Shahab Attarchi, M.D. in support Therof; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by maria vasquez (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOINGS & GOINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHADRACK MARK ALLEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL