This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 16:17:06 (UTC).

MARIA VARELA VS J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 MARIA VARELA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7335

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VARELA MARIA

Defendants

BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC.

BEST WESTERN PALM DESERT RESORT

DOE GREG

DOE REBECCA

J AND S HOSPITALITY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GALLAGHER MARYANN PATRICIA

Defendant Attorneys

ROLLER AMBER L

KIM HAEWON

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

12/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/16/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/17/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANGEMENT CONFERENCE

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/17/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMBER L. ROLLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE;

10/17/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF AMBER L. ROLLER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC.'S NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE;

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

10/12/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Answer

10/7/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMBER L. ROLLER

9/20/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF AMBER L. ROLLER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

6/14/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

6/17/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/01/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 02/01/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) scheduled for 02/01/2023 at 02:00 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet in Department 50 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/27/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Varela (Plaintiff); As to: J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC. (Defendant); BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); Greg Doe (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Varela (Plaintiff); As to: J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC. (Defendant); BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); Greg Doe (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Varela (Plaintiff); As to: J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC. (Defendant); BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); Greg Doe (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J AND S HOSPITALITY, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEST WESTERN INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARYANN P. GALLAGHER ATTORNEY AT LAW