This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 18:20:59 (UTC).

MARIA TOVAR VS CABO CANTINA LLC

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 MARIA TOVAR filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CABO CANTINA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4898

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

TOVAR MARIA

Respondents and Defendants

CABO CANTINA LLC

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

DOWNTOWN LA LAW GROUP

FRADKIN IGOR ESQ.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF RUSSELL R. ARENS

NUSBAUM RICHARD EDGAR ESQ..

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

3/5/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

ANSWER OF CABO CANTINA L.A., LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS CABO CANTINA, LLC TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA TOVAR

4/2/2018: ANSWER OF CABO CANTINA L.A., LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS CABO CANTINA, LLC TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA TOVAR

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

2/21/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

SUMMONS -

2/21/2018: SUMMONS -

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/23/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Reply - REPLY OF CABO CANTINA L.A., LLC TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIAL

12/9/2019: Reply - REPLY OF CABO CANTINA L.A., LLC TO PLAINTIFF OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIAL

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIAL

12/2/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIAL

Motion to Bifurcate

11/27/2019: Motion to Bifurcate

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIA...)

12/23/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BIFURCATE LIABILITY FROM DAMAGES AT TRIA...)

Ex Parte Application - JOINT EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/30/2020: Ex Parte Application - JOINT EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION - JOINT EX-PARTE APPLICATION ...)

1/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION - JOINT EX-PARTE APPLICATION ...)

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

1/29/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL 90 DAYS DUE TO COVID-19

3/24/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL 90 DAYS DUE TO COVID-19

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL 90 DAYS DUE TO COVID-19

6/25/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL 90 DAYS DUE TO COVID-19

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4/22/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • Hearing02/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL); Filed by Cabo Cantina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL 90 DAYS DUE TO COVID-19); Filed by Cabo Cantina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Cabo Cantina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Cabo Cantina LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketANSWER OF CABO CANTINA L.A., LLC, ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS CABO CANTINA, LLC TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA TOVAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Tovar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Tovar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694898    Hearing Date: December 23, 2019    Dept: 2

Tovar, et al. v. Rangel

Defendant’s Motion to Bifurcate Liability from Damage at Trial is DENIED.

The Court has the discretion to bifurcate liability from damage at trial when “the convenience of witnesses, the ends of justice, or the economy and efficiency of handling the litigation would be promoted thereby.” Code Civ. Proc. § 598. Defendant has not shown that bifurcation will serve those aims here. Defendant argues that if it obtains a verdict in its favor on the issue of liability, there will be no need to determine damages. That is true of every personal injury case, but this does not require bifurcation of every personal injury case. The facts of a particular case must justify bifurcation. Foreman & Clark Corp. v. Fallon (1971) 3 Cal. 3d 875, 888, fn. 8. Here, the Court concludes that judicial economy and efficiency will be best served by having all the issues determined in a single trial. The motion is thus denied. 

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CABO CANTINA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRADKIN IGOR