This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2023 at 04:42:49 (UTC).

MARIA T. BALESTRERI, ET AL. VS UNIVERSAL STUDIOS, INC.;, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 MARIA T BALESTRERI, filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNIVERSAL STUDIOS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0537

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BALESTRERI MARIA T.

BALESTRERI THOMAS J.

Defendants

AND DOES 1 TO 20 INCLUSIVE

UNIVERSAL STUDIOS INC.;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HINEY DONALD D

Defendant Attorney

CHUNG JAION

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/30/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

9/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/29/2022: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 05/03/2022

5/3/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT) OF 05/03/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

5/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT)

Answer

4/1/2022: Answer

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

4/19/2022: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

1/24/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

1/6/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/6/2022: Complaint

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/6/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/6/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

1/6/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

1/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Universal City Studios LLC Erroneously Sued As Universal Studios, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference RE: Status of Removal to Federal Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase is Deemed Complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Status of Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 09/30/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference RE: Status of Removal to Federal Court scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Removal to Federal Court) of 05/03/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/03/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 01/02/2025 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria T. Balestreri (Plaintiff); Thomas J. Balestreri (Plaintiff); As to: Universal Studios, Inc. (Defendant); and DOES 1 TO 20 Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria T. Balestreri (Plaintiff); Thomas J. Balestreri (Plaintiff); As to: Universal Studios, Inc. (Defendant); and DOES 1 TO 20 Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL STUDIOS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hiney, Donald D