This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2022 at 11:30:11 (UTC).

MARIA SOTO, ET AL. VS CITY OF TORRANCE

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 MARIA SOTO, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF TORRANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1095

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CASTRO MARITZA

SOTO MARIA

Defendant

CITY OF TORRANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARRILLO MICHAEL S. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/22/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/22/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

9/22/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Complaint

9/22/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

9/22/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESUS

9/27/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JESUS

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSE

9/30/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR JOSE

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2024
  • Hearing09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2024
  • Hearing03/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jose; Signed and Filed by: Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); As to: Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jose: Filed By: Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff),Maritza Castro (Plaintiff),Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff),Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jesus; Signed and Filed by: Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); As to: Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Jesus: Filed By: Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff),Maria Soto (Plaintiff),Maritza Castro (Plaintiff),Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/07/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 09/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Soto (Plaintiff); Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jesus Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maritza Castro (Plaintiff); Jose Obeso, a minor through his guardian ad litem, Maria Romero (Plaintiff); As to: City of Torrance (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Audra Mori in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF TORRANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRILLO MICHAEL SANTINO