This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:56:08 (UTC).

MARIA SORIA VS DESIGN TO BUILD DEVELOPMENTS INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 MARIA SORIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DESIGN TO BUILD DEVELOPMENTS INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8331

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SORIA MARIA

CANDELARIA ERIK ERNEST

MACARENO PAULINE

DESIGN TO BUILD DEVELOPMENTS INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

PAZ FELICIA

GARCIA FELICIA M PAZ

GARCIA FELICIA MARIA

VENTURA FELICIA

CANDELARIA ERIK ERNEST

PINCHEIRA ALEXIS

CHAVEZ EMILIANO

GARCIA FELICIA

RIVERO VERONICA

MACARENO PAULINE

DESIGN TO BUILD DEVELOPMENTS INC.

CHAVEZ ART

AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA BUSINESS

GARCIA FELICIA AKA FELICIA MARIA GARCIA AKA FELICIA PAZ AKA FELICIA M GARCIA PAZ AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHAVEZ EMILIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEFFAINE STELNICK

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

FORRY CRAIG BRIAN

FORRY LAW GROUP

KAKOIAN HAKOB JACK

TRESTER FREDRIC W

Other Attorneys

STELNICK STEFFAINE

 

Court Documents

Legacy Document -

10/4/2018: Legacy Document -

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/7/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration re: Due Diligence

12/10/2018: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Cross-Complaint

1/7/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/9/2019: Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/10/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

1/17/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

1/17/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

1/18/2019: Answer

Answer

1/22/2019: Answer

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B293064

1/30/2019: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed B293064

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/25/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

4/5/2019: Notice - NOTICE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • Hearing10/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • Hearing10/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F47 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE & ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) FOR DEPT. F47 DURING COVID-19 PANDEMIC; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([NOTICE & ORDER RE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (MSC) FOR DEPT. F47 DURING COVID-19 PANDEMIC]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (for the Continuance of the MSC); Filed by PAULINE MACARENO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA SORIA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: PC058331    Hearing Date: July 10, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 7/10/20

Case #PC058331

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED ANSWER

Motion filed on 3/2/20.

MOVING PARTY: Defendant Emiliano Chavez

RESPONDING PARTY: Plaintiff Maria Soria

RELIEF REQUESTED: An order granting Defendant Emiliano Chavez leave to file a Second Amended Answer to Plaintiff’s Second Amended Complaint.

RULING: The motion is denied without prejudice.

This action arises out of Plaintiff’s claim that Defendant breached an oral agreement to sell her certain real property.

Defendant has failed to comply with the requirements set forth in CRC 3.1324. Defendant does not state what allegations are proposed to be added to the previous pleading, and where, by page, paragraph, and line number. See CRC 3.1324(a)(3).

Additionally, the declaration of attorney Kakoian filed in support of the motion fails to clearly set forth when the facts giving rise to the amended allegations were discovered and the reasons why the request for amendment was not made earlier. See CRC 3.1324(b)(3)(4). Attorney Kakoian states that Defendant answered Plaintiff’s Second Amended Complaint in January 2019, the parties immediately engaged in written discovery, and “[a]t the offset of discovery,” it became evident that multiple affirmative defenses were inadvertently left out of Defendant’s First Amended Answer. (See Kakoian Decl. ¶¶3-4). Later, attorney Kakoian claims that once he realized additional affirmative defenses were necessary, he acted quickly in seeking a stipulation to file an amended answer. (Id. at ¶8). However, attorney Kakoian fails to explain why he waited until 1/28/20 to ask Plaintiff’s counsel to stipulate to the filing of a Second Amended Answer if he was aware of the need to do so in January of 2019 and/or how that constitutes acting quickly. (Id. at ¶¶3-5). Further, attorney Kakoian incorrectly states that Defendant proposes to add 11 new affirmative defenses when he actually seeks to add 12 (the First Amended Answer contains 7 affirmative defenses while the proposed Second Affirmative Answer contains 19). (See Kakoian Decl. ¶6, Ex.B; First Amended Answer filed 1/17/19). Also, Defendant never specifically identifies all of the new affirmative defenses he seeks to add by way of this motion. (Kakoian Decl. ¶6); CRC 3.1324(a)(3), (b)(1)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AZTEC FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STELNICK STEFFANIE DANIELLE