Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2019 at 01:46:02 (UTC).

MARIA SOLANO VS CITY OF WEST COVINA ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 MARIA SOLANO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF WEST COVINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7027

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SOLANO MARIA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

WEST COVINA CITY OF

ZASLOW DAVID

ZASLOW CAROL LYNN

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

DOES 1-50

Cross Defendant

WEST COVINA CITY OF [ROE 1]

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MARCHETTI FRANK E. ESQ.

SANCHEZ JOSE ELIAS

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

KRANKER GARY S. ESQ.

LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV & DUNCAN

KRANKER GARY STEVEN ESQ.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MUHAR GARBER AV & DUNCAN

 

Court Documents

Response - RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION OF LAND; DECL OF MELISSA M. BALLARD

10/10/2019: Response - RESPONSE AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION OF LAND; DECL OF MELISSA M. BALLARD

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION OF LAND OFF CALENDAR

10/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TAKING MOTION TO COMPEL INSPECTION OF LAND OFF CALENDAR

Separate Statement

9/24/2019: Separate Statement

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION OF PROPERTY

10/2/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL SITE INSPECTION OF PROPERTY

Reply - REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION CONTESTING ZASLOWS' NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR A GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

8/21/2019: Reply - REPLY TO OPPO TO MOTION CONTESTING ZASLOWS' NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR A GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/22/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION CONTESTING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

7/1/2019: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION CONTESTING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT DETERMINATION

Answer - Answer to Cross Complaint

10/16/2018: Answer - Answer to Cross Complaint

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

6/5/2019: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT; APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

7/18/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

4/10/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

4/18/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR TOTAL INDEMNITY, IMPLIED PARTIAL INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT

4/18/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR TOTAL INDEMNITY, IMPLIED PARTIAL INDEMNITY, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND EQUITABLE APPORTIONMENT

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

3/23/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/3/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY 2. NEGLIGENT - PREMISES LIABILITY

3/6/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY 2. NEGLIGENT - PREMISES LIABILITY

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • Hearing03/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Hearing02/07/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • Hearing01/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Taking Motion To Compel Inspection Of Land Off Calendar); Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketResponse (and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Site Inspection of Land; Decl of Melissa M. Ballard); Filed by West Covina, City Of (Defendant); West Covina, City of [ROE 1] (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketOpposition (to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Site Inspection of Property); Filed by David Zaslow (Legacy Party); Carol Lynn Zaslow (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Solano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY 2. NEGLIGENT - PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST COVINA CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCHETTI FRANK E.