This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/07/2019 at 01:28:58 (UTC).

MARIA SOCORRO AHUMADA VS DANIEL REYES GARCIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2018 MARIA SOCORRO AHUMADA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL REYES GARCIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0886

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

AHUMADA MARIA SOCORRO

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

THE ESTATE OF TERRY W. ADAMS (DECEDENT)

ADAMS SARA ERNA

GARCIA NANCY MEZA

GARCIA DANIEL REYES

DOES 1-50

ADAMS TERRY W.

ADAMS TERRY W. FKA THE ESTATE OF TERRY W. ADAMS

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

GARCIA NANCY MEZA

GARCIA DANIEL REYES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

AKIVA NIAMEHR LLP

Defendant Attorney

BURGOS RICHARD

Other Attorneys

DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

8/30/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/30/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

8/30/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY, APPORTIONMENT, DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

SUMMONS

8/30/2018: SUMMONS

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

3/28/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name

3/28/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Answer

4/3/2019: Answer

Answer

4/3/2019: Answer

Association of Attorney

4/10/2019: Association of Attorney

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY , APPORTIONMENT DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

7/31/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY , APPORTIONMENT DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

7/31/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

7/31/2018: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS

7/31/2018: SUMMONS

CIVIL DEPOSIT

6/19/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

6/19/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

6/19/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

SUMMONS

6/19/2018: SUMMONS

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Answer (to Cross-Complaint); Filed by Sara ERna Adams (Legacy Party); Terry W. Adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Answer (to Complaint); Filed by Sara ERna Adams (Legacy Party); Terry W. Adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Maria Socorro Ahumada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Jacoby & Meyers Attorneys LLP (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Maria Socorro Ahumada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR IMPLIED INDEMNITY , APPORTIONMENT DECLARATORY RELIEF AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Daniel Reyes Garcia (Legacy Party); Nancy Meza Garcia (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Socorro Ahumada (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOHERTY JOHN JOSEPH