This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2023 at 11:07:51 (UTC).

MARIA SHANE, ET AL. VS YGRENE ENERGY FUND, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2019 MARIA SHANE, filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against YGRENE ENERGY FUND, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CHRISTOPHER K. LUI, RICHARD L. FRUIN and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1321

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

RICHARD L. FRUIN

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

ANNA VAYNBERG TRUSTEE

RAVI FINANCIAL LLC

MOYSEY VAYNBERG TRUSTEE

POLISHUK OSCAR

SHANE MARIA

CLAUDIA L. SHANE TRUSTEE

YURI D. SHANE TRUSTEE

SHANE CLAUDIA L.

VAYNBERG MOYSEY

VAYNBERG ANNA

SHANE YURI D.

1ST POINT LENDING INC.

NELSON ALEX

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Respondents

SMART SOLAR ENERGY SALES INC.

RENOVATE AMERICA INC.

PACE FUNDING GROUP LLC

MALDONADO BEATRICE

YGRENE ENERGY FUND INC.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

CALIFORNIA STATEWIDE COMMUNITIES DEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

NEUDECKER JAMES

TIPPENS MARCUS L.

MILLER JESSE LUKE

SATTLER ALLEN EDWARD

PALUCH DANIEL

Cross Defendant Attorneys

LY JOHN K

GREENBLATT FREDRIC J

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

8/30/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT; . HEARING ON EX P...)

7/13/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT; . HEARING ON EX P...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR AN ORDER (1) DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BEATRICE MALDONADO BY PUBLICATION AND (2) DEFENDANT SMART SOLAR E

7/12/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR AN ORDER (1) DIRECTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS ON DEFENDANT BEATRICE MALDONADO BY PUBLICATION AND (2) DEFENDANT SMART SOLAR E

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

7/12/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/2/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/26/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

1/26/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/26/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

1/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/6/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/6/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

1/3/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

259 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff); As to: Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No; Service Cost: 448.74; Service Date: 08/25/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Default scheduled for 01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Status of Default scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/09/2024 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application Parte Application Of Plaintiffs For An Order (1) Directing Service Of Summons On Defendant Beatrice Maldonado By Publication And (2) Defendant Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. By Delivery Of Process To Secretary Of State; Memorandum Of Points And Autho: Filed By: Yuri D. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff),Moysey Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff),Maria Shane (Plaintiff),Anna Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff),Claudia L. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff),Ravi Financial, LLC (Plaintiff),Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Default; . Hearing on Ex P...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order (1) Directing Service Of Summons On Defendant Beatrice Maldonado By Publication And (2) Defendant Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. By Delivery Of Process To Secretary Of State; Memorandum Of Points And Autho scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 updated: Result Date to 07/13/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketEx Parte Application Parte Application Of Plaintiffs For An Order (1) Directing Service Of Summons On Defendant Beatrice Maldonado By Publication And (2) Defendant Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. By Delivery Of Process To Secretary Of State; Memorandum Of Points And Autho; Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustee (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustee (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application For An Order (1) Directing Service Of Summons On Defendant Beatrice Maldonado By Publication And (2) Defendant Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. By Delivery Of Process To Secretary Of State; Memorandum Of Points And Autho scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
537 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. a California Corporation to Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketAddress for Sonia Plesset Edwards (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant), Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant), Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant) to Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant), Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. (Defendant), Renovate America, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant), Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant), Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) to Renovate America, Inc. (Defendant), Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant), Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. a California Corporation (Defendant), Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant), Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant) to Beatrice Maldonado (Defendant), Smart Solar Energy Sales, Inc. (Defendant), Renovate America, Inc. (Defendant), Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant), Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC, a Wyoming LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustees of The Vaynberg Family Trust Dated June 6, 2002 (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustees of The Shane Family Trust Dated December 7, 2002 (Plaintiff); As to: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant); Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant); Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC, a Wyoming LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustees of The Vaynberg Family Trust Dated June 6, 2002 (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustees of The Shane Family Trust Dated December 7, 2002 (Plaintiff); As to: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant); Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant); Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Shane (Plaintiff); Yuri D. Shane (Plaintiff); Ravi Financial, LLC, a Wyoming LLC (Plaintiff); Moysey Vaynberg (Plaintiff); Anna Vaynberg, Trustees of The Vaynberg Family Trust Dated June 6, 2002 (Plaintiff); Oscar Polishuk (Plaintiff); Claudia L. Shane, Trustees of The Shane Family Trust Dated December 7, 2002 (Plaintiff); As to: Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc. (Defendant); Pace Funding Group, LLC (Defendant); Renovate America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Richard L. Fruin in Department 15 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less