This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 14:55:23 (UTC).

MARIA SANTOYO ET AL VS W&J INSTALLATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 MARIA SANTOYO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against W J INSTALLATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4857

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ MYNOR

SANTOYO MARIA

Defendants

W&J INSTALLATION INC

RIOS ANDY ISSAC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH

MALDONADO JOSE ANGEL JR.

Defendant Attorney

VICTOR LEON ARDEN

 

Court Documents

Unknown

2/16/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J I1STALLATIONS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1; ETC

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO?S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J I1STALLATIONS? FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1; ETC

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATION INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATION INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ERIKA CONTRERAS, ESQ.

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF ERIKA CONTRERAS, ESQ.

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYOS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION;AND ETC.

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYOS MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION;AND ETC.

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISAAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISAAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATIONS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATIONS INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORY 17.1

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL. DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S MOTION TO COMPEL. DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION; ETC

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTO VO?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISAAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTO VO?S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISAAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATION INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

5/7/2018: PLAINTIFF MARIA SANTOYO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT W&J INSTALLATION INC.'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION

DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE AND FOR SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF

6/1/2018: DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANDY ISSAC RIOS' FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE AND FOR SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

6/13/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

6/13/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/17/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Unknown

2/6/2019: Unknown

Minute Order

2/19/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/19/2019: Unknown

Notice of Settlement

4/2/2019: Notice of Settlement

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA SANTOYO (Plaintiff); MYNOR GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by MARIA SANTOYO (Plaintiff); MYNOR GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Final Status Conference) of 02/19/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by MARIA SANTOYO (Plaintiff); MYNOR GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by W&J INSTALLATION INC (Defendant); ANDY ISSAC RIOS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA SANTOYO (Plaintiff); MYNOR GONZALEZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH