This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/17/2020 at 04:17:59 (UTC).

MARIA SANDOVAL VS LA METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 MARIA SANDOVAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LA METROPOLITAN TRANSIT AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5146

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SANDOVAL MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

MORLIN ASSET MANAGEMENT

LOS ANGELES METROPOLITAN TRANSIT

DOES 1 TO 50 INCLUSIVE

NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION

LOS ANGELES METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PARIS ERIC D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MURPHY MICHAEL EMMET

GLAZER WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

7/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND TO PRODUCE

7/24/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEMAND TO PRODUCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

8/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING (AMENDED)

8/12/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING (AMENDED)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

5/12/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MURPHY IN SUPPORT OF MSJ

Separate Statement

5/12/2020: Separate Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE CONTINUANCE OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY OR...) OF 04/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS)

3/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS) OF 03/24/2020

3/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF MOTIONS) OF 03/24/2020

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED, ETC.

4/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT'S CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED, ETC.

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

3/10/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL METRO'S DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE

3/13/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL METRO'S DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS, SET ONE

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/28/2019: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

11/22/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/29/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Complaint -

2/20/2018: Complaint -

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • Hearing04/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Hearing02/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Dismissal of defendant Morlin Asset Management) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order To Correct Staff Header on Minute Order o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Holly E. Kendig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Los Angeles Metropolitan Transit (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Maria Sandoval (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695146    Hearing Date: August 06, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA SANDOVAL,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

LACMTA, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC695146

[TENTATIVE] ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT’S MOTIONS TO COMPEL AND MOTION TO DEEM RFAS ADMITTED MOOT

Dept. 31

10:30 a.m.

August 6, 2020

Defendant, LACMTA propounded special interrogatories, form interrogatories, RFAs, and RPDs on Plaintiff on 11/01/19. To date, despite an attempt to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendant therefore seeks an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding interrogatories and RPDs and deeming the RFAs admitted.

On 7/24/20, Plaintiff filed an opposition to each motion to compel and the motion to deem RFAs admitted. Plaintiff provides that she served responses without objections to each discovery request on 7/24/20. As of 7/31/20, no reply has been filed. The court finds that the motions to compel and deem RFAs admitted are moot in light of the responses served on Defendant prior to the hearing.

The sole remaining issue is whether to impose sanctions. Sanctions are mandatory. §§2030.290(c), 2031.300(c), 2033.280(c). Defendant does not, however, seek imposition of sanctions, and therefore none are imposed.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 6th day of August, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court