This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 12:52:24 (UTC).

MARIA SANDOVAL-CEJA VS JOSE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/03/2018 MARIA SANDOVAL-CEJA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are EDWARD B. MORETON and MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8311

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

EDWARD B. MORETON

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANDOVAL-CEJA MARIA

Defendants

OLIVAREZ OFELIA MARTINEZ

HERNANDEZ JOSE DE JESUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HERRING CONRAD ATTORNEY AT LAW

HERRING CONRAD CHRISTIAN

MILLER MARTY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DEARMEY MILO F. ESQ.

DEARMEY M. STEPHEN

LILLARD SANDRA

SHAPIRO SANDRA E.

DEARMEY MATTHEW

DEARMEY MATTHEW STEPHEN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/23/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/15/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

6/7/2022: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/7/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

6/7/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITE AND TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON NON-STATUROTY MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

6/8/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITE AND TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON NON-STATUROTY MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT AND TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON NON-STATUTORY MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

6/8/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT AND TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON NON-STATUTORY MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

6/8/2022: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration of Notice

6/8/2022: Declaration of Notice

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF SPECIAL DAMAGES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

6/9/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF SPECIAL DAMAGES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OFELIA HERNANDEZS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR; (1) LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT OFELIA HERNANDEZS

6/9/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT OFELIA HERNANDEZS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR; (1) LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMIT AND (2) TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANT OFELIA HERNANDEZS

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO ALLEGATIONS IN PRIOR ACTION SUBJECT TO RES JUDICATA, COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL AND WAIVER AND RELEASE; REQUEST FOR J

6/9/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO 2 EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO ALLEGATIONS IN PRIOR ACTION SUBJECT TO RES JUDICATA, COLLATERAL ESTOPPEL AND WAIVER AND RELEASE; REQUEST FOR J

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO ALLEGATIONS IN FOR WHICH THERE IS NO EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

6/9/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3: EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO ALLEGATIONS IN FOR WHICH THERE IS NO EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: EXCLUDE CHARACTER EVIDENCE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

6/9/2022: Motion re: - MOTION RE: MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: EXCLUDE CHARACTER EVIDENCE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/9/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

132 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other Motion In Limine No. 9 Exclude Evidence of Causes of Action After Trial on Special Defenses Based on Statute of Limitations and Res Judicata (CCP 597)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 8: EXCLUDE EVIDENCEATTACHED AS EXHIBIT TO THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7: EXCLUDE EVIDENCE?AGREEMENT PLAINTIFF CAN STAY IN HOME REST OF HER LIFE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • Hearing12/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6: EXCLUDE CHARACTER EVIDENCE; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4: EXCLUDE ALL EXPERT TESTIMONY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5: EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE OF SPECIAL DAMAGES; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW S. DEARMEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Hearing11/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3. EXCLUDE ALL EVIDENCE, TESTIMONY AND REFERENCE TO ALLEGATIONS IN FOR WHICH THERE IS NO EVIDENTIARY SUPPORT; RJN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • Hearing11/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • Hearing10/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other In Limine

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Sandoval-Cejam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Maria Sandoval-Cejam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: ELDER ABUSE; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY/CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST; BREACH OF CONTRACT; NEGLIGENCE; EMOTIONAL DISTRESS AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Sandoval-Cejam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT: FRAUD; ELDER ABUSE; BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY/CONSTRUCTIVE TRUST; WASTE; BREACH OF CONTRACT; NEGLIGENCE; NEGLIGENT AND INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS; PUNITIVE DAMAGES, COSTS, ATTORNEY'S FEES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Sandoval-Cejam (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Conrad Herring

Attorney at Law

California State Bar No. 157057 3525 Del Mar Heights Rd, No. 305 San Diego, CA 92130

FILED

SuBETIar Oeyur of Balife: ounty of Los Anaarr

APR -3 2018

S;herri R. Carter, Exezutive Officer/Clerk . B Deplity ancy Alvarez

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

MARIA SANDOVAL-CEJA

Plaintiff,

JOSE DE JESUS HERNANDEZ;

OFELIA MARTINEZ OLIVAREZ (AKA

OFELIA HERNANDEZ; Does 1-10,

Defendants.

Case No. BC688311 \Q'/

PROOF OF SERVICE:

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO

RULE 472(a)

The undersigned, Conrad Herring, certifies that on April 2, 2018, he served

a copy of Plaintiff's Notice and First Amended Complaint on the following parties

by U.S. mail with postage prepaid in Carlsbad, CA:

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRING CONRAD ATTORNEY AT LAW