Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/17/2019 at 20:58:52 (UTC).

MARIA SALAZAR VS ANDREW GALKER

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 MARIA SALAZAR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREW GALKER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1566

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SALAZAR MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

GALKER ANDREW

DOES 1-25

Other

MICHAEL CHRISTINA F.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AZIZI DANIEL ESQ.

AZIZI DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

NATOLI NOELLE M.

FOLEY & MANSFIELD

 

Court Documents

Unknown

4/4/2018: Unknown

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN]) AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARC L. SMITH

4/4/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (SET TWO); REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AN]) AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF MARC L. SMITH

PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/27/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT ANDREW GALKER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

5/8/2018: DEFENDANT ANDREW GALKER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

NOTICE OF RULING: TRANSFER OF COURT

5/16/2018: NOTICE OF RULING: TRANSFER OF COURT

Unknown

5/31/2018: Unknown

Unknown

6/5/2018: Unknown

Case Management Statement

6/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/30/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

8/10/2018: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

10/29/2018: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/16/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration

12/7/2018: Declaration

Motion to Compel

12/21/2018: Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel

12/21/2018: Motion to Compel

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/26/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • at 3:42 PM in Department O; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Final Status Conference Schedul...) of 05/08/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re Final Status Conference Schedul...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • at 09:15 AM in Department O; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 09:30 AM in Department O; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Compel (to appear and testify at deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department O; Hearing on Motion to Compel (to appear and testify at deposition) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Andrew Galker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Taking Motions to Compel off Calendar); Filed by Andrew Galker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2017
  • ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Salazar (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less