This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2021 at 03:02:35 (UTC).

MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THREE STAR GLOBAL INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THREE STAR GLOBAL INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MEL RED RECANA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6564

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MEL RED RECANA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBLES AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA

Defendants

NEXT LEVEL STAFFING A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GREAT RIVER FOOD A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

RICE FIELD CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GREAT RIVER FOOD CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

THREE STAR GLOBAL INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAYAB DAVID

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

7/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: DEFAULT)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/20/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

1/12/2021: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/12/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/30/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/4/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/15/2020: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • Hearing10/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 45 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Default Prove Up Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Default Prove Up Hearing - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Default Prove Up Hearing)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Status Conference (ReDefault) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Default)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 45, Mel Red Recana, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less