This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/11/2021 at 18:46:20 (UTC).

MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ROCHELLE H. STERLING AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROCHELLE H STERLING AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7120

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBLES AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA

Defendant

ROCHELLE H. STERLING AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERBIN ANTHONY W.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/8/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

PI General Order

11/3/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • Hearing03/23/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA ROBLES, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERBIN ANTHONY W.