This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 02:59:18 (UTC).

MARIA RINA CLEMENNTE VS JESSICA AKOPYAN

Case Summary

On 04/01/2021 MARIA RINA CLEMENNTE filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JESSICA AKOPYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2398

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEMENNTE MARIA RINA

Defendant

AKOPYAN JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LUCERO LINDA

 

Court Documents

PI General Order

4/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/1/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

4/1/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Complaint

4/1/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2024
  • Hearing03/28/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • Hearing09/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Rina Clemennte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Rina Clemennte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Rina Clemennte (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCERO LINDA