This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 04:51:37 (UTC).

MARIA RAMIREZ VS MARSHALL PATTISON

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 MARIA RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARSHALL PATTISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8122

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

RAMIREZ MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

PATTISON MARSHALL

DOES 1 TO 25

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PLOTKIN MICHAEL E. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

CALENDO PUCKETT SHEEDY LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

4/13/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES

4/13/2018: NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MARSHALL PATTISON, TO COMPLAINT

4/13/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MARSHALL PATTISON, TO COMPLAINT

ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

7/5/2018: ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Motion to Compel Discovery

10/23/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

10/23/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery

Minute Order

11/9/2018: Minute Order

Ex Parte Application

11/9/2018: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Ruling

1/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

3/22/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

3/22/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

1/26/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE (UNLIMITED - OVER $25,000.00) 1. NEGLIGENCE

1/26/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE (UNLIMITED - OVER $25,000.00) 1. NEGLIGENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, FSC, and Related Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial, FSC, and R...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Marshall Pattison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial, FSC, and Related Discovery and Motion Cut-Off Dates); Filed by Marshall Pattison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Marshall Pattison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (verified answers without objections to form interrogatories;request for sanctions for $360.00) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (verified answers without objections to demand for identification and production of documents;request for sanctions for $360.00) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Marshall Pattison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • ORDER AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Marshall Pattison (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF ADVANCE JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • ANSWER OF DEFENDANT, MARSHALL PATTISON, TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGE (UNLIMITED - OVER $25,000.00) 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Maria Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC648122    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 5

MARIA RAMIREZ,

Plaintiff,

v.

MARSHALL PATTISON, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: BC648122

Hearing Date: January 17, 2020

[Tentative] order RE:

MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF

Plaintiff Maria Ramirez (“Plaintiff”) filed this action following a motor vehicle collision with Defendant Marshall Pattison (“Defendant”). Now, Defendants seek to compel a physical examination of Plaintiff by an orthopedic surgeon. Defendants also seek sanctions of $500 for the non-appearance fee associated with a prior attempted examination. The motion establishes good cause for the examination, and Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Therefore, it is granted.

CONCLUSION AND ORDER

Based on the foregoing, Defendants’ motion to compel a physical examination of Plaintiff is granted. Plaintiff is ordered to appear for a medical examination conducted by Dr. Scott Lewis Rosenzweig at 1450 10th Street, Suite #302 in Santa Monica, California on a date noticed by Defendant. Plaintiff shall pay Defendants $500, by and through counsel, within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendants shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 17, 2020 ___________________________

Hon. Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court