This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 05:43:52 (UTC).

MARIA R. CHICAS REYES VS DARREN MCGHEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 MARIA R CHICAS REYES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DARREN MCGHEE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL M. CROWLEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8737

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL M. CROWLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REYES MARIA R. CHICAS

Defendants

DOES 1 TO 25 INCLUSIVE

MCGHEE DARREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUIGG VINCENT J

Defendant Attorney

CODY MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Related Case

3/21/2022: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/27/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2022

9/1/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 09/01/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/1/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice of Settlement

8/31/2022: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

10/5/2022: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maria R. Chicas Reyes on 10/20/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maria R. Chicas Reyes as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Maria R. Chicas Reyes (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 10/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/01/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 09/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Maria R. Chicas Reyes (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria R. Chicas Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Darren Mcghee (Defendant); Does 1 to 25, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria R. Chicas Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Darren Mcghee (Defendant); Does 1 to 25, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria R. Chicas Reyes (Plaintiff); As to: Darren Mcghee (Defendant); Does 1 to 25, Inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF VINCENT J QUIGG - VINCENT J. QUIGG