This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2020 at 12:16:24 (UTC).

MARIA PONCE VS BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 MARIA PONCE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN, A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6827

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PONCE MARIA AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendants

TORRES MARCO AN INDIVIDUAL

LYUBAREV MIKHAIL

CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS SERVICE A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA

BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A CALIFORNIA DOMESTIC NONPROFIT CORPORATION DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARRISON TODD HAMILTON

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/30/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

1/30/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

1/8/2020: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Request for Dismissal

4/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA PONCE, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by MARIA PONCE, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA PONCE, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA PONCE, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA PONCE, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLUE SHIELD OF CALIFORNIA PROMISE HEALTH PLAN A NONPROFIT ORGANIZATION AKA CARE1ST PARTNER PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA PHYSICIANS' SERVICE DBA BLUE SHIELD OF CA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRISON TODD HAMILTON