This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/12/2020 at 08:01:29 (UTC).

MARIA PEREZ SANDI VS COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/09/2017 MARIA PEREZ SANDI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JON R. TAKASUGI, HOLLY E. KENDIG, SAMANTHA JESSNER, LAURA F. PRIVER and THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2927

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JON R. TAKASUGI

HOLLY E. KENDIG

SAMANTHA JESSNER

LAURA F. PRIVER

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners and Appellants

PEREZ-SANDI MARIA

MARIA PEREZ-SANDI

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

LADWP

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

LOS ANGLES CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 50

CITY OF LOS ANGELES A MUNICIPAL ENTITY

ADELPHIA COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION {DOE 1]

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

TIME WARNER CABLE COMPANY

SPECTRUM

CHARTER COMMUNICATIONS INC.

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BURUNSUZYAN MARO

BURUNSUZYAN MARO ESQ.

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BURUNSUZYAN MARO ESQ.

Defendant, Respondent and Cross Defendant Attorneys

HURRELL THOMAS C. ESQ.

ANDERSON KEVIN C. DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

GRAVEN JOSEPH CHARLES

BURUNSUZYAN MARO

JOFFE STEVEN J.

PANOSIAN SAVADA M.

CHUKWUEKE CATHERINE OGECHI

HURRELL THOMAS CHARLES

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

GRAVEN JOSEPH CHARLES

JOFFE STEVEN J.

ANDERSON KEVIN CLIFFORD

 

Court Documents

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS

6/15/2020: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX PLAINTIFF'S COSTS

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

6/17/2020: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE ...)

6/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL; HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE ...)

Special Verdict

3/16/2020: Special Verdict

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

3/12/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM QUESTIONING ANY WITNESS, OR REFERENCING IN ANY MANNER, WHO REFERRED PLA

2/26/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 12 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANT FROM QUESTIONING ANY WITNESS, OR REFERENCING IN ANY MANNER, WHO REFERRED PLA

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS REPLY TO DEFENDANT L.A.U.S.D.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO, DESCRIPTION OF, OR PUBLICATION TO THE JURY OF

2/20/2020: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS REPLY TO DEFENDANT L.A.U.S.D.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO, DESCRIPTION OF, OR PUBLICATION TO THE JURY OF

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDI'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE SUB ROSA VIDEO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CATHERINE CHUKWUEKE

2/14/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDI'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE SUB ROSA VIDEO; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF CATHERINE CHUKWUEKE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED ORTHOPEDIC EXPERT DR. GREGORY H. TCHEJEYAN FROM OFFERING ANY O

2/18/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 10 FOR AN ORDER PRECLUDING DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED ORTHOPEDIC EXPERT DR. GREGORY H. TCHEJEYAN FROM OFFERING ANY O

Request for Dismissal

2/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

2/5/2020: Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/21/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO ANYTHING CONTRADICTING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MARCH 1, 20

1/31/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE ANY REFERENCE TO ANYTHING CONTRADICTING DEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICTS MARCH 1, 20

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE [PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ANY MEDICAL LIEN OR PARTICULAR MEDICAL CARE HAVING BEEN RECE

2/3/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE [PROPOSED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDIS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO PRECLUDE REFERENCE TO ANY MEDICAL LIEN OR PARTICULAR MEDICAL CARE HAVING BEEN RECE

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/1/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR GENERAL NEGLIGENCE, PERSONAL INJURY AND PEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/30/2018: DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR GENERAL NEGLIGENCE, PERSONAL INJURY AND PEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

SUMMONS -

11/9/2017: SUMMONS -

167 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: 06/17/20 B306341); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Maro Burunsuzyan (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Perez-Sandi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketAppellate Order Extension of Time (NOA: 06/17/20 B306341); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Default Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:18 AM in Department X; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:13 AM in Department X; Ruling on Submitted Matter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 06/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketBrief (Los Angeles Unified School District's Acceptance of the Court's $65,000.00 Additur to the Jury Verdict); Filed by Los Angeles Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
225 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT'S ANSR TO PLAINTIFF MARIA PEREZ-SANDI'S COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Perez-Sandi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Perez-Sandi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Maria Perez-Sandi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Perez-Sandi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC682927    Hearing Date: February 10, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA PEREZ-SANDI,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC682927

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

February 10, 2020

Plaintiff, Maria Perez-Sandi filed this action against Defendants, County of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, LAUSD, and LADWP for damages arising out of a trip and fall on an uncovered utility vault.  Numerous doe defendants have been added to the action, including Doe 4, Charter Communications, Inc. 

At this time, Charter has agreed to settle all claims with Plaintiff for $50,000.  Defendant seeks an order from the Court finding that the settlement is in good faith. 

Defendant timely and properly served the moving papers on all other defendants in the action.  Any opposition to the motion was due on or before 1/28/20.  No party has filed opposition to the motion.  The burden on a motion for determination of good faith settlement rests squarely on the party opposing the finding of good faith.  CCP §877.6(d).  In light of the lack of opposition, no party has met that burden.  The motion for determination of good faith settlement is therefore granted.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice. 

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.