Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 06:10:26 (UTC).

MARIA OSORTO VS THE KROGER CO.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 MARIA OSORTO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE KROGER CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSORTO MARIA

Defendant

THE KROGER CO. DBA FOOD 4 LESS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANG GRACE LEA

Defendant Attorney

D'ORO FRANK J.

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/11/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

6/11/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/16/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA RE ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

4/16/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata re Answer to Complaint); Filed by The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Errata re Demand for Jury Trial); Filed by The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The Kroger Co. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Osorto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Osorto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Osorto (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG GRACE LEA