This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/15/2023 at 11:09:03 (UTC).

MARIA MORENO VS BREVILLE USA, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2022 MARIA MORENO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BREVILLE USA, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. FAHEY and TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2936

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORENO MARIA

Defendants

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

BREVILLE USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANITZ ERIC A.

Defendant Attorneys

CAIN PATRICK J.

MCATEE NICOLE R.

SAXON BRANDON D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/14/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

1/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT E OF

1/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT E OF

Answer - ANSWER OF ADO PROFESSIONAL SOLUTIONS, INC., TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

12/15/2022: Answer - ANSWER OF ADO PROFESSIONAL SOLUTIONS, INC., TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Notice of Appearance

11/10/2022: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/10/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/9/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

11/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

9/9/2022: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

8/19/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

7/20/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

7/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 07/25/2022

7/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE FILED AGAINST...) OF 07/25/2022

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2023
  • Hearing05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 05/25/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Breville USA, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Case Management Conference): Status Date changed from 01/18/2023 to 01/18/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Case Management Conference) to (Case Management Conference) ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/01/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Plaintiff's Peremptory Challenge filed against...) of 07/25/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Maria Moreno (Plaintiff); Judge Name: William F. Fahey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William F. Fahey in Department 69 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: BREVILLE USA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: BREVILLE USA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Moreno (Plaintiff); As to: BREVILLE USA, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); ACCOUNTING PRINCIPALS, INC., a Florida corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less