This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 05:33:51 (UTC).

MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ VS AVB LA VILLA MARIA MARKET INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AVB LA VILLA MARIA MARKET INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and MELVIN D. SANDVIG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6919

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

MELVIN D. SANDVIG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MERCED RAMIREZ MARIA

MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ

RAMIREZ MARIA MERCED

Respondents and Defendants

BOBADILLA JOSE L.

Newhall, CA 91321

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ROMERO GUADALUPE

Newhall, CA 91321

A V B LA VILLA MARIA MARKET INC.

AVB LA VILLA MARIA MARKET INC.

JOSE L. BOBADILLA

GUADALUPE ROMERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

YOUNGER ROBERT J. ESQ.

THE YOUNGER LAW FIRM

FIRM THE YOUNGER LAW

 

Court Documents

Brief - BRIEF - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

12/14/2020: Brief - BRIEF - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. YOUNGER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA MERCED RAMIREZS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRAN

12/16/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT J. YOUNGER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA MERCED RAMIREZS MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRAN

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

12/16/2020: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/18/2020

12/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 12/18/2020

Notice of Ruling

10/28/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF MSC FSC AND TRIAL

10/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF MSC FSC AND TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED (SET...)

10/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED (SET...)

Notice of Ruling

9/9/2020: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

7/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE WITH CORRECTED POS

7/6/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE WITH CORRECTED POS

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/22/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/22/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

7/22/2020: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

7/22/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM RFA'S ADMITTED

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE) of 12/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketMotion in Limine (TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED); Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF ROBERT J. YOUNGER, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ?S MOTION IN LIMINE TO PROCEED BY ORAL TESTIMONY OR DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFF ONLY GIVEN THE ORDERS GRANTING PLAINTIFF?S MOTIONS TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED); Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketBrief (- MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Guadalupe Romero (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted ((Set One, as to Defendant Guadalupe Romero)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F47, Melvin D. Sandvig, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (Set One, as to Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla)) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Maria Merced Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); Maria Merced Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); Maria Merced Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued; Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); Maria Merced Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by MARIA MERCED RAMIREZ (Plaintiff); Maria Merced Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6919    Hearing Date: October 28, 2020    Dept: F47

Dept. F-47

Date: 10/28/20

Case #****6919

4 MOTIONS TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED

Motions filed on 7/22/20

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Maria Merced Ramirez

RESPONDING PARTY # 1: Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla

RESPONDING PARTY # 2: Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla

RESPONDING PARTY # 3: Defendant Guadalupe Romero

RESPONDING PARTY # 4: Defendant Guadalupe Romero

NOTICE: ok

RELIEF REQUESTED:

(1) An order deeming Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, Set 1, served on Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla on 2/4/19, admitted. Additionally, Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant Bobadilla in the amount of $772.50;

(2) An order deeming Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, Set 2, served on Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla on 11/20/19, admitted. Additionally, Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant Bobadilla in the amount of $772.50;

(3) An order deeming Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, Set 1, served on Defendant Guadalupe Romero on 2/4/19, admitted. Additionally, Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant Bobadilla in the amount of $772.50;

(4) An order deeming Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, Set 2, served on Defendant Guadalupe Romero on 11/20/19, admitted. Additionally, Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant Bobadilla in the amount of $772.50.

RULING: The unopposed motions are granted as set forth below.

Due to Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla’s and Defendant Guadalupe Romero’s failure to provide responses to Plaintiff’s Requests for Admissions, Set 1, and Requests for Admissions, Set 2, Plaintiff is entitled to orders deeming the matters admitted. See CCP 2033.280(b), (c). Additionally, the imposition of sanctions on Defendants is mandatory due to their failure to provide responses. Id. The Court finds that sanctions in the amount of $500.00 for each motion is warranted. Therefore, sanctions in the amount of $1,000.00 are imposed on Defendant Jose L. Bobadilla and sanctions in the amount of $1,000.00 are imposed against Defendant Guadalupe Romero. Sanctions are payable within 30 days.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNGER ROBERT JOSEPH