This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:48:38 (UTC).

MARIA MELENDEZ VS CITY OF LOS ANGELES ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2017 MARIA MELENDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF LOS ANGELES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1142

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MELENDEZ MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

LOS ANGELES CITY OF

LOS ANGELES COUTNY OF

VAN NUYS CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

DECTON INC.

CAM SERVICES

NF PLANT ENTERPRISES L.P. DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

GHERMEZIAN RAYMOND ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

FEUER MICHAEL N. CITY ATTORNEY

LORCH GARY J. ESQ.

LORCH GARY J

 

Court Documents

ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NF PLANT ENTERPRISES L.P. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA MELENDEZ

3/21/2018: ANSWER OF DEFENDANT NF PLANT ENTERPRISES L.P. TO COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF MARIA MELENDEZ

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/8/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Mail

11/21/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Answer

12/12/2018: Answer

Declaration

12/28/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/28/2018: Declaration

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/28/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Notice

3/6/2019: Notice

Opposition

3/11/2019: Opposition

Order

3/15/2019: Order

Minute Order

3/15/2019: Minute Order

Notice

3/19/2019: Notice

Unknown

5/23/2019: Unknown

Notice

5/24/2019: Notice

ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

12/4/2017: ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT CITY OF LOS ANGELES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

11/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/26/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY. PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE ? 835 ET SEQ.: ETC

10/26/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY. PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE ? 835 ET SEQ.: ETC

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Entry of Judgment); Filed by NF PLANT ENTERPRISES, L.P. (DOE 1) (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judgment ([Proposed] Judgment); Filed by NF PLANT ENTERPRISES, L.P. (DOE 1) (Defendant); Decton, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Judgment ([Proposed] Judgment); Filed by NF PLANT ENTERPRISES, L.P. (DOE 1) (Defendant); Decton, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by MARIA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Notice (Notice of Entry of Order Granting Motion by Defendants NF Plant Enterprises LP and Decron Properties Corp for Summary Judgment); Filed by NF PLANT ENTERPRISES, L.P. (DOE 1) (Defendant); Decton, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARIA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARIA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MARIA MELENDEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: LIABILITY FOR DANGEROUS CONDITION OF PUBLIC PROPERTY. PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 835 ET SEQ.: ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/1998
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/1998
  • Notice of Case Relocation Rescheduling; Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC681142    Hearing Date: January 31, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA MELENDEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC681142

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT OF COSTS

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

January 31, 2020

1. Background Facts

Plaintiff, Maria Melendez filed this action against Defendants, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, and City of Van Nuys for damages arising out of a slip and fall. Plaintiff’s original complaint remains her operative complaint, and it includes causes of action for dangerous condition of public property and vicarious liability for wrongful acts or omissions by public entity employees.

On 11/29/17, Plaintiff dismissed the County. On 1/19/18, Plaintiff added NF Plant Enterprises, L.P. as Doe 1. On 4/27/18, Plaintiff dismissed the City of LA. On 11/08/18, Plaintiff added Decton, Inc. as Doe 2. On 12/12/18, Decron Properties Corp. filed an answer, apparently for erroneously named Decton, Inc. On 3/15/19, Plaintiff added CAM Services as Doe 3. On 7/15/19, Plaintiff added Jose Gutierrez as Doe 4.

On 3/15/19, the Court granted NF Plant and Decron’s motion for summary judgment. On 9/24/19, the Court granted CAM’s motion for summary judgment.

2. Motion to Compel Payment of Costs

At this time, CAM moves to compel Plaintiff to pay its costs associated with this action. CAM moves pursuant to CCP §1032, which permits a prevailing party to recover its costs in the action. The procedures for obtaining costs are governed by Judicial Council Rules. See CRC 3.1700, 3.1702, 3.2000. The Court knows of no authority for a motion to compel payment of costs, and none is cited in the moving papers; the motion is denied.

The Court notes that CAM served a notice of entry of judgment on 10/04/19; CAM has not, however, submitted a proposed judgment in the action to date. Unless and until CAM submits a proposed judgment, judgment will not be entered, and costs will consequently also not be entered.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.orgIf the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Case Number: BC681142    Hearing Date: November 15, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA MELENDEZ,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC681142

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 15, 2019

Plaintiff, Maria Melendez filed this action against Defendants, City of Los Angeles, County of Los Angeles, and City of Van Nuys for damages arising out of a slip and fall. Plaintiff’s original complaint remains her operative complaint, and it includes causes of action for dangerous condition of public property and vicarious liability for wrongful acts or omissions by public entity employees.

On 11/29/17, Plaintiff dismissed the County. On 1/19/18, Plaintiff added NF Plant Enterprises, L.P. as Doe 1. On 4/27/18, Plaintiff dismissed the City of LA. On 11/08/18, Plaintiff added Decton, Inc. as Doe 2. On 12/12/18, Decron Properties Corp. filed an answer, apparently for erroneously named Decton, Inc. On 3/15/19, Plaintiff added CAM Services as Doe 3. On 7/15/19, Plaintiff added Jose Gutierrez as Doe 4. The Court has previously granted summary judgment in favor of NF Plant, Decron, and CAM.

At this time, the doe defendant (Gutierrez) who was added to the action on 7/15/19 moves to continue trial. He argues that he was only recently added to the case, that he has had insufficient time to conduct discovery, and that he needs time to review the case and consider settlement options. Notably, Gutierrez filed his answer to the complaint on 9/26/19, only four months prior to the currently scheduled trial date.

The Court finds Defendant’s very recent addition to the case constitutes good cause for a continuance of the trial date. The Court finds the request for a six-month continuance reasonable, as this will result in a trial date approximately ten months after he appeared in the action.

The 1/29/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Wednesday, 7/29/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 1/15/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to 7/15/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 3. All discovery cut-off deadlines are continued to reflect the new trial date.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.