This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2022 at 04:41:29 (UTC).

MARIA MEJIA VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 MARIA MEJIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6845

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEJIA MARIA

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRISH VADIM FELIX

21900 Burbank Blvd., Suite 205

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

LEVENSON BRUCE EDWARD

Defendant Attorney

KOHRS CONRAD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/16/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

2/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

2/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Settlement

2/23/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/23/2022

2/23/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 02/23/2022

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FSC & TRIAL

11/12/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF FSC & TRIAL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/10/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

11/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/15/2020

Demand for Jury Trial

7/10/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/10/2019: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

3/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/3/2018: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint

12/3/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/3/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/3/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

12/3/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Docketat 3:45 PM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of 02/23/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Mejia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVENSON BRUCE EDWARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRISH VADIM FELIX