This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2022 at 16:57:26 (UTC).

MARIA MEDINA VS PLATINUM CLEANING OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC, A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 MARIA MEDINA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against PLATINUM CLEANING OF INDIANAPOLIS, LLC, A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0183

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEDINA MARIA

Defendant

PLATINUM CLEANING OF INDIANAPOLIS LLC A MISSOURI LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL JASMIN

Defendant Attorney

JOYCE JACLYN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/7/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/26/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/23/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2022
  • Hearing09/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Platinum Cleaning of Indianapolis, LLC, a Missouri limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Platinum Cleaning of Indianapolis, LLC, a Missouri limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Management Conference); Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Medina (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less