This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/20/2021 at 15:30:01 (UTC).

MARIA MARTINEZ VS OPORTUN, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 MARIA MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against OPORTUN, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2000

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ MARIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

OPORTUN INC.

EL RINCONCITO NUNEZ

Cross Defendant

ROES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZEESMAN ALEXANDER J.

ZEESMAN DIANA

Defendant Attorney

SAWYER JAMES FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

4/26/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/26/2021: Cross-Complaint

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

4/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2024
  • Hearing03/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • Hearing09/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Oportun, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN DIANA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEESMAN ALEXANDER JOSHUA