Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2021 at 05:22:13 (UTC).

MARIA MARTINEZ, ET AL. VS 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 MARIA MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8723

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOPEZ BARRERA MANUEL

MARTINEZ MARIA

Defendant

1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • Hearing09/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 17 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); MANUEL LOPEZ BARRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); MANUEL LOPEZ BARRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA MARTINEZ (Plaintiff); MANUEL LOPEZ BARRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 1630 ARAPAHOE ST LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O