This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/16/2023 at 21:26:11 (UTC).

MARIA MADRIGAL VS ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 MARIA MADRIGAL filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is AUDRA MORI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2148

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

AUDRA MORI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MADRIGAL MARIA

Defendants

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES

ALOYSIUS GONZAGA CATHOLIC CHURCH

CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL ENGINEERING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREENLY MARLENE DIANE

Defendant Attorney

GRANNIS FREDERIC F

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/10/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

12/10/2019: PI General Order

Answer

1/3/2020: Answer

Substitution of Attorney

1/10/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/4/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/4/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

5/4/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS PURSUANT TO E...)

5/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS PURSUANT TO E...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS PURSUANT TO E...) OF 05/06/2020

5/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS PURSUANT TO E...) OF 05/06/2020

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

6/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

6/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

6/29/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ANSWERS TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Ruling

9/16/2020: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

9/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

9/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY (NOT "FURTHER DISCOVERY"))

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

4/1/2021: Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement

Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (WITH APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS)

4/13/2021: Notice of Settlement - NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (WITH APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GFS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/10/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maria Madrigal on 11/25/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 12/15/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 12/15/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof o...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service on Any Newly Added Defendant scheduled for 10/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 updated: Result Date to 10/28/2021; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Maria Madrigal on 11/25/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Maria Madrigal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Madrigal (Plaintiff); As to: Archdiocese of Los Angeles (Defendant); Aloysius Gonzaga Catholic Church (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Maria Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Maria Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Madrigal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 3 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: *******2148 Hearing Date: July 30, 2021 Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA MADRIGAL,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******2148

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Dept. 31

8:30 a.m.

July 30, 2021

Plaintiff, Maria Madrigal (“Plaintiff”) filed this action against Defendants, St. Aloysius Gonzaga Catholic Church and the Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles erroneously sued herein as Archdiocese of Los Angeles, (collectively, “Defendants”). On June 1, 2021, Plaintiff filed an Amendment to Complaint naming California Professional Engineering, Inc. as Doe 1.

On April 1, 2021, Defendants filed the instant application for order determining the good faith of settlement with Plaintiff. At the May 24, 2021 Final Status Conference, the court set a hearing on Defendants’ motion for determination of good faith settlement for July 30, 2021, and ordered Defendants to give notice. (Min. Order, May 24, 2021.) Defendants filed Notice of the Ruling with proof of service on May 25, 2021.

Plaintiff and Defendants have agreed to settle the claims against Defendants for $2,884.95. Defendants move for an order finding the settlement in good faith. No party has filed an opposition to the motion. The burden on a motion for determination of good faith settlement rests squarely on the party opposing the finding of good faith. (CCP ;877.6(d).) In light of the lack of opposition, no party has met that burden.

The motion for determination of good faith settlement is therefore granted.

Moving Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org. If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

Dated this 30th day of July, 2021

Hon. Charles Lee

Judge of the Superior Court

'


Case Number: *******2148    Hearing Date: September 16, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

MARIA MADRIGAL,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

ARCHDIOCESE OF LOS ANGELES, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: *******2148

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION DEFENDANT’S UNOPPOSED MOTIONS TO COMPEL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

September 16, 2020

 

Defendants, St. Aloysius Gonzaga Catholic Church and The Roman Catholic Archbishop of Los Angeles propounded form interrogatories, set one, special interrogatories, set one, and RPDs, set one, on Plaintiff on 1/3/20. To date, despite an extension and attempts to meet and confer, Plaintiff has not served responses. Defendants, therefore, seek an order compelling Plaintiff to respond, without objections, to the outstanding discovery and to pay sanctions.

Defendants’ motions are granted. Plaintiff is ordered to serve verified responses to form interrogatories, set one, special interrogatories, set one, and RPDs, set one, without objections, within ten days. (CCP ;;2030.290(a),(b), 2031.300(a),(b).)

Sanctions are mandatory. ;;2030.290(c), 2031.300(c). Defendants seek sanctions in varying amounts in connection with each motion. The court awards one hour to prepare each form discovery motion. No oppositions were filed and therefore no replies were necessary. The court awards the requested one hour to appear at the hearing, but only awards the time once. Thus, the court awards a total of six hours of attorney time at the rate of $200 per hour, or $1,200 in attorneys’ fees. The court also awards three filing fees of $61.65 each, or $184.95 in costs.

Sanctions are sought and imposed against Plaintiff and her attorney of record, jointly and severally; they are ordered to pay sanctions to Defendants, by and through their counsel of record, in the total amount of $1,384.95, within twenty days.

Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If the parties do not submit on the tentative, they should arrange to appear remotely.

 

Dated this 16th day of September, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court