This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/05/2022 at 17:18:51 (UTC).

MARIA LUZ RIVERA VS GONZALEZ MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

Case Summary

On 02/08/2022 MARIA LUZ RIVERA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GONZALEZ MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4811

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RIVERA MARIA LUZ

Defendant

GONZALEZ MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC DBA VALLARTA SUPERMARKETS

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/8/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/8/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/8/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/8/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/8/2022: Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/8/2022: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/8/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/8/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2025
  • Hearing02/04/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2023
  • Hearing08/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • Hearing07/25/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Luz Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Luz Rivera (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gonzalez Management Company is a litigant