This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2021 at 11:14:44 (UTC).

MARIA LOURDES CORTES, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS LUBBOCK TRUCK SALES, INC., A TEXAS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/12/2021 MARIA LOURDES CORTES, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LUBBOCK TRUCK SALES, INC , A TEXAS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1272

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ARREOLA AN INDIVIDUAL ANTHONY MARTIN

CORTES AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA LOURDES

Defendants

LUBBOCK TRUCK SALES INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION

SALAZAR AN INDIVIDUAL NICHOLAS

WHITE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES INC. A TEXAS CORPORATION

DURHAM MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAFFI DANIEL J

Defendant Attorney

MCCALL MICHAEL TODD

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/24/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

3/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

3/2/2021: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE

Answer

3/11/2021: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/23/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/17/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

1/13/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2024
  • Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • Hearing07/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by WHITE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WHITE TRANSPORTATION SERVICES, INC., a Texas corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Non-Service); Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA LOURDES CORTES, an individual (Plaintiff); ANTHONY MARTIN ARREOLA, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAFFI DANIEL J.