This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2022 at 20:46:50 (UTC).

MARIA LERMA, ET AL. VS RIVIERA NURSING & CONVALESCENT HOME, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 MARIA LERMA filed an Other lawsuit against RIVIERA NURSING CONVALESCENT HOME, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0524

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENRIQUEZ PEDRO M.

LERMA MARIA

Defendants

GRAND VIEW ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

RIVIERA NURSING & CONVALESCENT HOME INC.

TRESS AVROHM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;)

Notice of Settlement

7/18/2022: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 07/18/2022

7/18/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT;) OF 07/18/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • Hearing09/12/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • Docketat 5:00 PM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Regarding Notice of Settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Maria Lerma (Plaintiff); Pedro M. Enriquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Regarding Notice of Settlement;) of 07/18/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Lerma (Plaintiff); Pedro M. Enriquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Lerma (Plaintiff); Pedro M. Enriquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Lerma (Plaintiff); Pedro M. Enriquez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAND VIEW ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVIERA NURSING & CONVALESCENT HOME INC DBA RIVIERA HEALTHCARE CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA STEPHEN MICHAEL