This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2019 at 16:11:57 (UTC).

MARIA JOSEFA CARDONA VS GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE& WELLNESS

Case Summary

On 04/10/2017 MARIA JOSEFA CARDONA filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE WELLNESS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK C. KIM and MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1142

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARK C. KIM

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

J. ALFONSO CARDONA INDIVIDUALLY

BY AND THROUGH HER SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST

MARIA JOSEFA CARDONA

ALEX CARDONA INDIVIDUALLY

Defendants

LP(GRAND AVENUE)

CENTER(COUNTRY)

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES LLC

ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES

GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE

COUNTRY VILLA BELMONT HEIGHTS HEALTHCARE

ANGEL CARDONA A NOMINAL DEFT

ALFONSO CARDONA A NOMINAL DEFT

THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. DBA KINDRED

HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER (DOE 21)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANZONE MORGAN LLP

Defendant Attorneys

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY LLP

CLARK HILL

GIOVANNIELLO LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/21/2018: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

7/30/2018: Notice of Settlement

Notice

7/25/2018: Notice

Notice

7/24/2018: Notice

Request for Dismissal

7/20/2018: Request for Dismissal

Order

7/16/2018: Order

Stipulation

7/12/2018: Stipulation

Notice of Motion

7/9/2018: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

7/9/2018: Notice of Motion

Notice of Motion

7/9/2018: Notice of Motion

Motion to Compel

7/9/2018: Motion to Compel

Notice of Motion

7/9/2018: Notice of Motion

Reply

7/6/2018: Reply

Reply

7/5/2018: Reply

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SOS26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SOS26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Miscellaneous - Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketNotice-Settlement (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE -UNCONDITIONAL ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SOS26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Motion to Compel (THE DEPOSITION OF SHLOMO RECHNITZ) - Matter Placed Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND TAKING OFF CALENDAR PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO SET FOR JULY 26, 2018 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketNotice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND TAKING OFF CALENDAR THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF SHLOMO RECHNITZ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal-Partial (PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL AS TO THE FIRST CAUSE OF ACTION FOR ELDER ABUSE & NEGLECT AND SECOND CAUSE OF ACTON FOR VILATION OF PATIENTS BILL OF RIGHTS ONLY); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department SOS26, Michael P. Vicencia, Presiding; Motion For Protective Order ( GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE &WELLNESS CENRE, LP'S MOTIONFOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RE: 'SEXCESSIVE SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES-MTN TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OFSAGANDA BRADFORD AND HENRY SERVIDA) - Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE NON-EXPERT WITNESS DEPOSITIONS FILED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TANYA L. PROUTY IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY BY DEFENDANT THC ORANGE COUNTY, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF LODGMENT OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF THE PETITION TO COMPEL CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY BY DEFENDANT THC ORANGE COUNTY, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketStatement-Case Management (PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (PLAINTIFF'S AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT DOE 21 THE ORANGE COUNTY, INC. DBA KINDRED HOSPITAL WESTMINSTER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed (ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES BY DEFENDANTS GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE, LP AND ROCKPORT ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl (PARTY SERVED: CENTRE, LP, DBA COUNTRY VILLA BELMONT HEIGHTS HEALTHCARE CENTER PERSON SERVED: ANDREA ORTIZ ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketFinancial Documents(PC2620)- Filed (PLAINTIFF'S JURY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF ALEX CARDONA PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 377.32 AND WELFARE & INSTITUTIONS CODE 15657.3 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint Filed (SUMMONS ISSUED ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRAND AVENUE HEALTHCARE & WELLNESS CENTRE is a litigant

Latest cases where ROCKPORT HEALTHCARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where THC-ORANGE COUNTY INC. is a litigant