Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2021 at 22:10:53 (UTC).

MARIA HIDALGO, ET AL. VS BAVARIA TRADING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 MARIA HIDALGO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BAVARIA TRADING LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8745

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORNEJO LISETH

CORNEJO FRANCISCO

CORNEJO DAVID

HIDALGO MARIA

Defendants

BAVARIA TRADING LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

EXTRA ELENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARTIYELI JACOB O.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/19/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • Hearing10/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 58 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Hidalgo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Francisco Cornejo (Plaintiff); Liseth Cornejo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Francisco Cornejo (Plaintiff); Liseth Cornejo (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARTIYELI JACOB O