This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2019 at 00:10:04 (UTC).

MARIA HERNANDEZ VS CITY OF LONG BEACH ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury case was filed by MARIA HERNANDEZ against CITY OF LONG BEACH in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7432

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HERNANDEZ MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

HELEN A. KHARRAT & HABIB A. KHARRAT

LOS ANGELES COUNTY OF

LONG BEACH CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GEOULLA DANIEL D. ESQ.

GEOULLA DANIEL DANNY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

11/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 11/26/2019

11/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (JURY TRIAL) OF 11/26/2019

Order - Dismissal

11/26/2019: Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/24/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

5/24/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

SUMMONS -

5/24/2018: SUMMONS -

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Jury Trial) of 11/26/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Jury Trial)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC707432    Hearing Date: February 25, 2020    Dept: 29

Hernandez v. City of Long Beach, et al.

Motion to Set Aside/ Vacate Dismissal and to Reinstate the Action is GRANTED. Code Civ. Proc. § 473(b).

This action was filed on 5/24/2018. There is no proof of service of the summons and complaint in the court file, and no defendant has appeared.

At the time the action was filed, the trial was set for 11/26/2019. Plaintiff failed to appear at trial and the court dismissed the action pursuant to section 581(b)(3) of the Code of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff now seeks to set aside the dismissal under Code of Civil Procedure section 473(b), claiming mistake of counsel.

The application is timely made and is adequately supported by counsel’s declaration attesting that his office inadvertently marked the action as settled in its case management system. The court thus sets aside the dismissal.

Plaintiff is ordered to serve the summons and complaint forthwith and to comply with the applicable rules regarding filing proof of service.

The court sets the following dates:

OSC re dismissal for delay in prosecution under Code of Civil Procedure § 583.420(a)(1): 6/30/2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

Final Status Conference: September 10, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Dept. 29 of the spring Street Courthouse.

Trial: September 24, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept. 29 of the Spring Street Courthouse.

The Moving Party is ordered to give notice.