Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2020 at 05:50:06 (UTC).

MARIA HERNANDEZ BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MAURILIO ANTONIA SUAREZ, ET AL. VS LAC + USC MEDICAL CENTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 MARIA HERNANDEZ BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM, MAURILIO ANTONIA SUAREZ filed an Other lawsuit against LAC USC MEDICAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8356

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARIA HERNANDEZ BY AND THORUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM MAURILIO ANTONIA SUAREZ

SUAREZ MAURILIO ANTONIO

Defendants

GABRIEL ZADA M.D.

ALEXANDER GEORGE CHARTRAIN M.D.

JAMES YOUNG HO YU M.D.

MICHELLE LIN M.D.

DANIEL DONOHO M.D.

LAC + USC MEDICAL CENTER

PHILLIP ALAN BONNEY M.D.

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SILBERBERG MARSHALL

Defendant Attorney

LAW YUK KWONG

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

10/26/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

10/26/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF VANCE LEBRON FREDRICKSON, M.D.

9/15/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF VANCE LEBRON FREDRICKSON, M.D.

Request for Dismissal

9/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS

8/18/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION RE DISMISSAL OF INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/3/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

9/3/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Proof of Personal Service

8/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/11/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARIA

5/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM MARIA

PI General Order

5/19/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/19/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/13/2020: Complaint

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation re Dismissal of Vance Lebron Fredrickson, M.D.); Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by County of Los Angeles (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Stipulation re Dismissal of Individual Defendants); Filed by LAC + USC MEDICAL CENTER (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (Maria); Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Hernandez by and thorugh her Guardian ad Litem, Maurilio Antonia Suarez (Plaintiff); Maurilio Antonio Suarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where L.A.C./U.S.C. - MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant