This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2021 at 00:07:47 (UTC).

MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS CITY OF COMMERCE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CITY OF COMMERCE,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7982

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUTIERREZ AN INDIVIDUAL MARIA

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ARGOMANIZ ARTURO

CITY OF COMMERCE

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF COMMERCE

SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BINDER WARREN

Defendant Attorneys

FRISHMAN DAVID M

HAITH SCOTT C.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/15/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

9/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

10/16/2020: Request for Dismissal

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

7/23/2020: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

7/23/2020: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

9/8/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - NOT ENTERED

Answer

4/20/2020: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/20/2020: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/20/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

4/20/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/20/2020: Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial

4/20/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

4/20/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

4/29/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/29/2020: Cross-Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by CITY OF COMMERCE (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- Not Entered); Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by CITY OF COMMERCE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF COMMERCE (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA GUTIERREZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIALIC CONTRACTORS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF COMMERCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BINDER WARREN JAY