This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2022 at 21:09:15 (UTC).

MARIA GONZALEZ, ET AL. VS ARKEMA, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/01/2022 MARIA GONZALEZ, filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARKEMA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3991

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ GERARDO

GONZALEZ MARIA

GONZALEZ ROBERTO

Defendants

ARKEMA INC.

ARKEMA INC. F/K/A PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WALLACE & TIERNAN D/B/A WTS PHARMACRAFT FKA PENNWALT CORPORATION AND ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA INC.

AUTOZONE INC.; FKA AUTOZONE WEST INC.

AUTOZONE WEST LLC F/K/A AUTOZONE WEST INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO CHIEF AUTO PARTS DBA G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO

AVENTIS INC.;

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS LTD;

CHATTEM INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE GOLD BOND STERILIZING POWDER COMPANY A/K/A THE GOLD BOND COMPANY

COSMETIC SPECIALTIES INC. SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND FORMERLY D/B/A G&G SPECIALTY PRODUCTS CO.

CROWN LABORATORIES INC. FOR ITS DESENEX LINE OF PRODUCTS

DAP PRODUCTS INC.;

DONALD DURHAM COMPANY;

FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST AS SUCCESSOR TO FELT-PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION

FISONS CORPORATION;

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY A/K/A NAPA AKA NAPA

GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BLOCK DRUG CORPORATION SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO THE GOLD BOND STERILIZING POWDER COMPANY A/K/A THE GOLD BOND COMPANY; AKA THE GOLD BOND COMPANY

GSK CONSUMER HEALTH INC. F/K/A NOVARTIS CONSUMER HEALTH INC. F/K/A CIBA SELF-MEDICATION INC.

HENRY COMPANY LLC; AKA HIMMEL GROUP FORMERLY D/B/A MARTIN HIMMEL INC

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GAMBLE TYSON

Defendant Attorneys

BRAY KENDRA ELYSE

CALFO PAUL ANGELO

GOLDBERG KAREN B.

GOLODNITSKA VALERIA

HUGO EDWARD ROGER

HUIE JEREMY D.

IRWIN GEORGE HUMPHRIES

KADABA SEEMA N.

EBRAHAMIAN SALIN

JENKINS STEPHEN L.

KHARE VIIU SPANGLER

POND ESQ FRANK D

POND FRANK

SOLOMON KIMBERLY M.

MCGAH SEAN C.

REJCH BARTEK R.

ASPERICUETA ERIKA R.

BESSETTE PAUL M.

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED - PARTY IN 1(B)(6) NOT NAMED ON COMPLAINT)

7/11/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (NOT ENTERED - PARTY IN 1(B)(6) NOT NAMED ON COMPLAINT)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/28/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

6/16/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Substitution of Attorney

5/25/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/5/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

5/5/2022: Answer

Answer

4/25/2022: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER PC)

3/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE SIMON GREENSTONE PANATIER PC)

Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S ANSWER TO WRONGFUL DEATH ASBESTOS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

4/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER DEFENDANT CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD.S ANSWER TO WRONGFUL DEATH ASBESTOS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL

Demand for Jury Trial

4/7/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

4/7/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS (CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD)

4/11/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE SUMMONS (CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD)

Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

4/14/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH - ASBESTOS; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Request for Dismissal

2/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

115 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 1:45 PM in Department 15 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal ((Not Entered - Party in 1(b)(6) not Named on Complaint)); Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by NASSCO HOLDINGS INCORPORATED d/b/a GENERAL DYNAMICS NASSCO (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by PNEUMO ABEX LLC (sued as successor-in-interest to ABEX CORPORATION) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by FEDERAL-MOGUL ASBESTOS PERSONAL INJURY TRUST as successor to FELT-PRODUCTS MANUFACTURING CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by DONALD DURHAM COMPANY; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DONALD DURHAM COMPANY; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DONALD DURHAM COMPANY; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY, a subsidiary of SEMPRA ENERGY; (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
110 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (Summons (Calaveras Asbestos. Ltd.)); Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDefendant Arkema Inc.'s Notice of Posting Jury Fees; Filed by ARKEMA, INC. f/k/a PENNWALT CORPORATION and ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to WALLACE & TIERNAN d/b/a WTS PHARMACRAFT) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDefendant Arkema Inc.'s Demand for Jury; Filed by ARKEMA, INC. f/k/a PENNWALT CORPORATION and ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to WALLACE & TIERNAN d/b/a WTS PHARMACRAFT) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Docketof Remote Appearance; Filed by ARKEMA, INC. f/k/a PENNWALT CORPORATION and ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to WALLACE & TIERNAN d/b/a WTS PHARMACRAFT) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDefendant Arkema Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Wrongful Death - Asbestos; Filed by ARKEMA, INC. f/k/a PENNWALT CORPORATION and ELF ATOCHEM NORTH AMERICA, INC. (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to WALLACE & TIERNAN d/b/a WTS PHARMACRAFT) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Roberto Gonzalez (Plaintiff); Gerardo Gonzalez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Laboratories Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Aventis is a litigant

Latest cases where DONALD DURHAM COMPANY is a litigant