This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 16:57:38 (UTC).

MARIA GOMEZ VS EMILES MOBIL LLC

Case Summary

On 05/16/2018 MARIA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EMILES MOBIL LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6368

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

GOMEZ MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

EMILES MOBIL LLC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NOURMAND JOSEPH S. ESQ.

NOURMAND JOSEPH SALAR ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 12/04/2019

12/4/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT) OF 12/04/2019

Motion for Summary Judgment

7/23/2019: Motion for Summary Judgment

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/23/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Judicial Notice

7/23/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Separate Statement

7/23/2019: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/23/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION COMPENDIUM OF EVIDENCE LODGED IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT EMILES MOBIL, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTIN

8/13/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION DEFENDANT EMILES MOBIL, LLCS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO CONTIN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE O...)

8/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO ADVANCE THE HEARING DATE O...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff 's Verified Responses t...)

1/3/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff 's Verified Responses t...)

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Defendant Emile;s Mobil, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Request For Production O

11/20/2018: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Defendant Emile;s Mobil, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Request For Production O

Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Defendant Emile's Mobile, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Form Interrogatories An

11/20/2018: Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel Defendant Emile's Mobile, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Form Interrogatories An

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Answer -

7/31/2018: Answer -

SUMMONS -

5/16/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5/16/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Hearing05/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Hearing01/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • Hearing01/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 5 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docketat 1:37 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: Motion for Summary Judgment) of 12/04/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: Motion for Summary Judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to advance the hearing date on defendant's motion for summary judgment) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Plaintiff 's Verified Responses to Defendant's First Set of Form Interrogatories and Special Interrogatories; Request for Monetary Sanctions in the Amount of $1780.00) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Plaintiff 's Verified Responses t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Defendant Emile;s Mobil, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Request For Production Of Documents etc.); Filed by Emiles Mobil, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketMotion to Compel (Defendant Emile's Mobile, LLC'S Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff Maria Gomez's Verified Responses To Defendant's First Set Of Form Interrogatories And Special Interrogatories etc.); Filed by Emiles Mobil, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Maria Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Emiles Mobil, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria Gomez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC706368    Hearing Date: December 06, 2019    Dept: 5

Maria Gomez v. Emiles Mobil, LLC, et al., Case No. BC706368

Defendant filed a motion for summary judgment, which was noticed for hearing on December 6, 2019.  Then, on September 19, 2019, a “Notice of Settlement” was filed.  The Notice was filed by Daniel M. O’Leary (California State Bar #175128), purportedly on behalf of Plaintiff, but he is not counsel-of-record for Plaintiff.  Therefore, the Court continues the hearing on the motion for summary judgment to December 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m.  If Mr. O’Leary now represents Plaintiff, he is ordered to file a substitution of counsel form forthwith.  Defendant is ordered to meet-and-confer with Plaintiff’s counsel to determine whether this motion for summary judgment should be taken off-calendar.  The Court’s clerk shall provide notice.