This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/12/2023 at 06:10:10 (UTC).

MARIA GLORIA VEGA VS SUPERIOR PERSONNEL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 MARIA GLORIA VEGA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SUPERIOR PERSONNEL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0975

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VEGA MARIA GLORIA

Defendants

PORT LOGISTICS GROUP INC.

SUPERIOR PERSONNEL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KARCZEWSKI JACOB

Defendant Attorneys

HAN CHRISTOPHER

LE KATHY A.

 

Court Documents

All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

8/10/2023: All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT ((UN...)

8/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT ((UN...)

All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (CHECKLIST)

3/27/2023: All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (CHECKLIST)

All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (CHECKLIST)

3/27/2023: All Litigation Type Document (joint document on non-lead case) - FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (CHECKLIST)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/19/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

9/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/9/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/21/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION AND ...)

7/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION OF STIPULATION AND ...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

7/19/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/19/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

6/14/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION ...)

6/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE; NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: SUBMISSION ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

12/13/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

12/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

97 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2023
  • Hearing09/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketFINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT: As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement ((Un...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketFINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (checklist); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- FINAL RULINGS/ORDERS RE: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT; ADDENDUM (checklist): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Preliminary Approval scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/21/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 03/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Preliminary Approval scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 03/24/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing and Serving of Motion for Preliminary Approval scheduled for 12/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 9 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/20/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
245 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Port Logistics Group, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Port Logistics Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation to Port Logistics Group, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Personal Service: Document changed from Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) to Proof of Personal Service; As To Parties changed from Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant), Port Logistics Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant), Maria Gloria Vega (Plaintiff) to Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Maria Gloria Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 20 - Hon. David J. Cowaneffective 02/03/2020; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Dalila Corral Lyons in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Maria Gloria Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Port Logistics Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Maria Gloria Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Port Logistics Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Maria Gloria Vega (Plaintiff); As to: Superior Personnel, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Port Logistics Group, Inc., a Delaware corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less