Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 00:09:14 (UTC).

MARIA GARCIA ET AL VS EDWIN GUEVARA MONTANO

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 MARIA GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDWIN GUEVARA MONTANO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2746

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

VASQUEZ ISRAEL

VASQUES ISABEL

VASQUEZ MONICA

GARCIA MARIA

Defendants and Respondents

MONTANO EDWIN GUEVARA

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BIEDERMAN MARC

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

1/30/2019: Minute Order

SUMMONS

8/16/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

8/16/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 5, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by MARIA GARCIA (Plaintiff); ISABEL VASQUES (Plaintiff); MONICA VASQUEZ (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC672746    Hearing Date: January 11, 2021    Dept: 32

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 32

maria garcia, et al.,

Plaintiffs,

v.

edwin guevara montano,

Defendant.

Case No.: BC672746

Hearing Date: January 8, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

Motion To dismiss

Plaintiffs Maria Garcia, Isabel Vasquez, Monica Vasquez, and Israel Vasquez (“Plaintiffs”) filed this action against Defendant Edwin Guevara Montano (“Defendant”) following a motor vehicle collision. Now, Defendant specially appears and moves for dismissal per Code of Civil Procedure sections 583.210 and 583.250, which require the Court to dismiss any action if the summons and complaint are not served within three years. Plaintiffs filed the complaint on August 16, 2017, and no proof of service has been filed. Nor have Plaintiffs opposed this motion. Therefore, the motion is granted and the case is dismissed with prejudice. Defendant shall provide notice and file proof of such with the Court.

DATED: January 11, 2021 ___________________________

Stephen I. Goorvitch

Judge of the Superior Court