This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2022 at 00:53:53 (UTC).

MARIA G HERNANDEZ VS VICTOR MENDOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 MARIA G HERNANDEZ filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against VICTOR MENDOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9935

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ MARIA G

Defendants

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT TITLE ESTATE LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE COMPLAINT

MENDOZA VICTOR

MONTANO RICARDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASTELLUM OMAR

Defendant Attorney

POURMORADY KOUROSH MYER

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

1/20/2022: Answer

Answer

1/11/2022: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/2/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

2/28/2022: Order - ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

2/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [ORDER TRIAL PREPARATION]

Case Management Statement

2/22/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2023
  • Hearing05/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • Hearing04/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Order); Filed by Maria G Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Armen Tamzarian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Order Trial Preparation]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketOrder (Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Maria G Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ricardo Montano (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Victor Mendoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Maria G Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Maria G Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Maria G Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less