This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/29/2021 at 05:26:47 (UTC).

MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA , ET AL. VS 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2020 MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3134

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PALACIOS JULIE

PALACIOS PADILLA MARIA ELENA

Defendants

915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS LP.. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

AVANATH REALTY INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

Defendant Attorney

WOOD CARY L.

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/9/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/21/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Service - No Service

4/27/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Answer

4/20/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

1/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

1/31/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/23/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/23/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/23/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/23/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2023
  • Hearing01/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Hearing11/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Hearing11/05/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP.., a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP.., a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP.., a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS, LP.., a California limited partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA (Plaintiff); JULIE PALACIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA (Plaintiff); JULIE PALACIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA ELENA PALACIOS PADILLA (Plaintiff); JULIE PALACIOS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 915 HIGHLAND AVENUE PARTNERS LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOOD CARY L.