This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 04:26:04 (UTC).

MARIA ELENA MAYA VS LGI ASOCIATION INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 MARIA ELENA MAYA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against LGI ASOCIATION INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERRY A. GREEN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9049

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERRY A. GREEN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MAYA MARIA ELENA

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Defendants

CHIU JOHN C.

LGI ASSOCIATION INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 50

KARANDISH SAEID

YOUABIAN SHARONA

PJCF-T2 LLC

Respondents, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

LGI ASSOCIATION INCORPORATION

KARANDISH SAEID

YOUABIAN SHARONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MAHONEY KEVIN ESQ.

ALIAZIS DIONISIOS ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SCHLECHT KARL P. ESQ.

SCHLECHT KARL PATRICK

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CAWLFIELD CRAIG OWEN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/13/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

2/15/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/23/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/6/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/22/2018: Minute Order

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

4/20/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC.

Minute Order

5/14/2018: Minute Order

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

5/23/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

6/11/2018: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

6/11/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER

Unknown

7/13/2018: Unknown

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

7/13/2018: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION, IRC., SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA YOUABIAN FOR:

7/13/2018: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS LGI ASSOCIATION, IRC., SAEID KARANDISH AND SHARONA YOUABIAN FOR:

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/16/2018: Unknown

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Docketat 4:18 PM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 04/12/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Status Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • DocketAnswer ([Defendant John C. Chiu] to Plaint if's Second Amended Complaint); Filed by JOHN C. CHIU (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by MARIA ELENA MAYA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNotice; Filed by MARIA ELENA MAYA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by MARIA ELENA MAYA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • DocketCIVIL DEPOSIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • DocketNotice on Hearing About Court Fees; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PJCF-T2 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where LGI ASSOCIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAWLFIELD CRAIG OWEN